Docket for 12-1460
No. 12-1460 | |
Title: |
Ryan McFadyen, et al., Petitioners |
v. |
City of Durham, North Carolina, et al. |
|
Docketed: | June 17, 2013 |
Linked with 12A964 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (11-1458, 11-1460) |
Decision Date: | December 17, 2012 |
Rehearing Denied: | January 15, 2013 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Apr 4 2013 |
Application (12A964) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 15, 2013 to May 30, 2013, submitted to The Chief Justice. |
Apr 8 2013 |
Application (12A964) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until May 30, 2013. |
May 20 2013 |
Application (12A964) to extend further the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 30, 2013 to June 13, 2013, submitted to The Chief Justice. |
May 22 2013 |
Application (12A964) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until June 13, 2013. |
Jun 13 2013 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 17, 2013) |
Jul 15 2013 |
Waiver of right of respondents City of Durham, North Carolina, et al. to respond filed. |
Jul 17 2013 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 30, 2013. |
Jul 31 2013 |
Response Requested . (Due August 30, 2013) |
Aug 14 2013 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including October 4, 2013. |
Oct 4 2013 |
Brief of respondents City of Durham, North Carolina, et al. in opposition filed. |
Oct 17 2013 |
Reply of petitioners Ryan McFadyen, et al. filed. |
Oct 23 2013 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 8, 2013. |
Nov 12 2013 |
Petition DENIED. Justice Alito took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. |
|