Docket for 12-145
No. 12-145 | |
Title: |
Personhood Oklahoma, Petitioner |
v. |
Brittany Mays Barber, et al. |
|
Docketed: | August 1, 2012 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Oklahoma |
Case Nos.: | (110, 545) |
Decision Date: | April 30, 2012 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jul 30 2012 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 31, 2012) |
Aug 9 2012 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including September 28, 2012. |
Aug 21 2012 |
Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the petitioner, and counsel for the respondent. |
Aug 30 2012 |
Brief amicus curiae of Alliance Defending Freedom filed. |
Aug 30 2012 |
Brief amicus curiae of American Association of Pro-Life Obstetricians and Gynecologists (AAPLOG) filed. |
Aug 30 2012 |
Brief amicus curiae of American Life League filed. |
Aug 31 2012 |
Brief amici curiae of Issues 4 Life Foundation, et al. filed. |
Aug 31 2012 |
Brief amici curiae of Joyce Meyer Ministries, Inc., et al. filed. |
Aug 31 2012 |
Brief amici curiae of Foundation for Moral Law, et al. filed. |
Sep 28 2012 |
Brief of respondents Brittany Mays Barber, et al. in opposition filed. |
Oct 9 2012 |
Reply of petitioner Personhood Oklahoma filed. (Distributed) |
Oct 10 2012 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 26, 2012. |
Oct 29 2012 |
Petition DENIED. |
|
|
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | | |
Mathew D. Staver |
Liberty Counsel | (800) 671-1776 |
Counsel of Record | 1055 Maitland Center Commons | |
| Second Floor | |
| Maitland, FL 32751 | |
| court@lc.org |
Party name: Personhood Oklahoma |
Attorneys for Respondents: | | |
Michelle Movahed |
Center for Reproductive Rights | (917) 637-3600 |
Counsel of Record | 120 Wall Street, 14th Floor | |
| New York, NY 10005 | |
| mmovahed@reprorights.org |
Party name: Brittany Mays Barber, et al. |
Other: | | |
David A. Cortman |
Alliance Defending Freedom | (770) 339-0774 |
| 1000 Hurricane Shoals Road, N.E. | |
| Suite D 1100 | |
| Lawrenceville, GA 30043 | |
| dcortman@alliancedefendingfreedom.org |
Party name: Alliance Defending Freedom |
| | |
Benjamin D. DuPre |
Foundation for Moral Law, Inc. | (334) 262-1245 |
| One Dexter Avenue | |
| Montgomery, AL 36104 | |
| bdupre@morallaw.org |
Party name: Foundation for Moral Law, et al. |
| | |
Robert L Sassone |
10444 Falcon Ave. | (714) 962-8107 |
| Fountain Valley, CA 92708 | |
| rlsassone@aol.com |
Party name: American Life League |
| | |
Linda Boston Schlueter |
Trinity Legal Center | (210) 697-8202 |
| 11120 Wurzbach, Suite 206 | |
| San Antonio, TX 78230 | |
| TLC4Linda@aol.com |
Party name: American Association of Pro-Life Obstetricians and Gynecologists (AAPLOG) |
| | |
Catherine W. Short |
Life Legal Defense Foundation | (707) 224-6675 |
| P.O. Box 2105 | |
| Napa, CA 92544 | |
| LLDFOjai@cs.com |
Party name: Issues 4 Life Foundation, et al. |
| | |
Herbert W. Titus |
William J. Olson, PC | (703) 356-5070 |
| 370 Maple Avenue West, Suite 4 | |
| Vienna, VA 22180 - 5615 | |
| wjo@mindspring.com |
Party name: Joyce Meyer Ministries, Inc., et al. |