Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results

        

Docket for 11-798
No. 11-798
Title:
American Trucking Associations, Inc., Petitioner
v.
City of Los Angeles, California, et al.
Docketed:December 23, 2011
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(10-56465)
  Decision Date:October 31, 2011
Questions Presented

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Dec 22 2011 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 23, 2012)
Jan 4 2012 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including February 21, 2012, for all respondents.
Jan 23 2012 Brief amici curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence, et al. filed.
Jan 23 2012 Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed.
Jan 23 2012 Brief amicus curiae of Owner-Operator Independent Drivers Association, Inc. filed.
Jan 23 2012 Brief amicus curiae of Airlines for America filed.
Feb 21 2012 Brief of respondents National Resources Defense Council, et al. in opposition filed.
Feb 21 2012 Brief of respondents City of Los Angeles, California, et al. in opposition filed.
Mar 2 2012 Reply of petitioner American Trucking Associations, Inc. filed.
Mar 7 2012 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 23, 2012.
Mar 26 2012 The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
Nov 30 2012 Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Dec 10 2012 Supplemental brief of petitioner American Trucking Associations, Inc. filed.
Dec 12 2012 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 4, 2013.
Jan 7 2013 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 11, 2013.
Jan 11 2013 Petition GRANTED limited to Questions 1 and 3 presented by the petition.
Feb 11 2013 SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Tuesday, April 16, 2013
Feb 15 2013 Brief of petitioner American Trucking Associations, Inc. filed.
Feb 15 2013 Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed.)
Feb 22 2013 Brief amicus curiae of the United States supporting reversal filed.
Feb 22 2013 Brief amici curiae of Owner-Operator Independent Drivers Association, Inc. filed.
Feb 22 2013 Brief amicus curiae of Airlines for America filed.
Feb 22 2013 Brief amicus curiae of California Construction Trucking Association filed.
Feb 22 2013 Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence and Harbor Trucking Association filed.
Feb 22 2013 Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America. filed.
Feb 25 2013 Record from U.S.C.A. for 9th Circuit is electronic.
Feb 25 2013 Record from U.S.D.C. for Central District of California is electronic..
Mar 1 2013 CIRCULATED.
Mar 18 2013 Brief of respondents City of Los Angeles, California, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Mar 18 2013 Brief of respondents National Resources Defense Council, et al. (Distributed) filed.
Mar 25 2013 Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Mar 25 2013 Brief amicus curiae of Los Angleles Chamber of Commerce filed. (Distributed)
Mar 25 2013 Brief amici curiae of National Organization of Counties, et al. filed.
Mar 25 2013 Brief amicus curiae of Airports Council International - North America filed.
Mar 25 2013 Brief amici curiae of California and Washington filed. (Distributed)
Apr 1 2013 Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Apr 5 2013 Reply of petitioner American Trucking Associations, Inc. filed. (Distributed).
Apr 16 2013 Argued. For petitioner: Daniel N. Lerman, Washington, D. C.; and John F. Bash, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.) Steve Rosenthal for the respondents.
Jun 13 2013 Adjudged to be REVERSED IN PART and case REMANDED. Kagan, J., delivered the opinion for a unanimous Court. Thomas, J., filed a concurring opinion.
Jul 15 2013 JUDGMENT ISSUED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Roy T. Englert Jr. Robbins, Russell, Englert, Orseck, Untereiner & Sauber LLP(202) 775-4500
    Counsel of Record1801 K Street, N.W., Suite 411L
Washington, DC  20006
renglert@robbinsrussell.com
Party name: American Trucking Associations, Inc.
 
Daniel N. Lerman 1801 K Street, NW Suite 411L(202)-775-4500
Washington, DC  20006
dlerman@robbinsrussell.com
Party name: American Trucking Associations, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents:
Melissa Lin Perrella National Resources Defense Council(310) 434-2300
    Counsel of Record1314 Second Street
Santa Monica, CA  90401
mlinperrella@nrdc.org
Party name: National Resources Defense Council, et al.
 
Steven S. Rosenthal Kaye Scholer LLP(202) 682-3500
    Counsel of RecordThe McPherson Building
901 Fifteenth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20005-2327
srosenthal@kayescholer.com
Party name: City of Los Angeles, California, et al.
Other:
John F. Bash Assistant to the Solicitor General
Department of Justice
Washington, DC  20530
Party name: American Trucking Associations, Inc. v. City of Los Angeles, California, et al.
 
Michael Harlan Burger Roger Williams University(401)-254-4610
School of Law
10 Metacom Avenue
Bristol, RI  02809
mburger@rwu.edu
Party name: National Organization of Counties, et al.
 
Anthony T. Caso Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence(714) 628-2666
c/o Dale E. Fowler School of Law at Chapman University
One University Drive
Orange, CA  92886
caso@chapman.edu
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence, et al.
 
Jeffrey Bossert Clark Kirkland & Ellis LLP(202) 879-5960
655 Fifteenth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20005
jeffrey.clark@kirkland.com
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
 
Paul D. Cullen Sr. The Cullen Law Firm, PLLC(202) 944-8600
1101 30th Street, N.W., Suite 300
Washington, DC  20007
pdc@cullenlaw.com
Party name: Owner-Operator Independent Drivers Association, Inc.
 
Paul Damien Cullen 1101 30th Street N.W., Suite 300(202)-944-8600
Washington, DC  20007
pxc@cullenlaw.com
Party name: Owner-Operator Independent Drivers Association, Inc., et al.
 
Albert Quoc Giang Caldwell Leslie & Proctor PC(213)-629-9040
725 South Figueroa Street, 31st Floor
Los Angeles, CA  90017-5524
giang@caldwell-leslie.com
Party name: Los Angleles Chamber of Commerce
 
Susan Duncan Lee 455 Golden Gate Ave., Suite 11000(415) 703-5500
San Francisco, CA  94102-7004
susan.lee@doj.ca.gov
Party name: California and Washington
 
W. Eric Pilsk Kaplan Kirsch & Rockwell LLP(202) 955-5600
100 Connecticut Aevnue
Washington, DC  20036
epilsk@kaplankirsch.com
Party name: Airports Council International - North America
 
Robert K. Spotswood Spotswood Sansom & Sansbury LLC(205) 986-3620
940 Concord Center
2100 Third Avenue North
Birmingham, AL  35203
Party name: Airlines for America
 
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: the United States
 
Patrick J. Whalen Law Office of Brooks Ellison(916) 448-2187
1725 Capitol Avenue
Sacramento, CA  95811
attorneys@ellisonlawoffices.com
Party name: California Construction Trucking Association
December 19, 2014 | Version 2014.1