Docket for 11-421
No. 11-421 | |
Title: |
Mahmoad Abdah, et al., Petitioners |
v. |
Barack H. Obama, President of the United States, et al. |
|
Docketed: | October 5, 2011 |
Linked with 11A57 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (05-5224) |
Decision Date: | April 25, 2011 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jul 13 2011 |
Application (11A57) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 24, 2011 to September 22, 2011, submitted to The Chief Justice. |
Jul 15 2011 |
Application (11A57) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until September 22, 2011. |
Sep 22 2011 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 4, 2011) |
Nov 4 2011 |
Waiver of right of respondents Barack H. Obama, President of the United States, et al. to respond filed. |
Nov 14 2011 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of December 2, 2011. |
Nov 30 2011 |
Response Requested . (Due December 30, 2011) |
Dec 19 2011 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including January 30, 2012. |
Jan 27 2012 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including February 29, 2012. |
Feb 29 2012 |
Brief of respondents Barack H. Obama, President of the United States, et al. in opposition filed. |
Mar 21 2012 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 13, 2012. |
Mar 21 2012 |
Reply of petitioners Mahmoad Abdah, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Apr 16 2012 |
Petition DENIED. Justice Kagan took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. |
|