Docket for 11-1447
No. 11-1447
Title:
Coy A. Koontz, Jr., Petitioner
v.
St. Johns River Water Management District
Docketed:June 1, 2012
Linked with 11A909
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Florida
  Case Nos.:(SC09-713)
  Decision Date:November 3, 2011
  Rehearing Denied:January 4, 2012
Questions Presented

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Mar 20 2012 Application (11A909) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 3, 2012 to June 1, 2012, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Mar 30 2012 Application (11A909) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until June 1, 2012.
May 30 2012 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 2, 2012)
Jun 22 2012 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 1, 2012.
Aug 1 2012 Brief of respondent St. Johns River Water Management District in opposition filed.
Aug 14 2012 Reply of petitioner Coy A. Koontz, Jr. filed. (Distributed)
Aug 15 2012 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 24, 2012.
Oct 1 2012 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 5, 2012.
Oct 5 2012 Petition GRANTED.
Oct 31 2012 SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Tuesday, January 15, 2013.
Nov 6 2012 Conditional consent to the fiing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the petitioner.
Nov 8 2012 The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including November 21, 2012.
Nov 8 2012 The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including December 21, 2012.
Nov 13 2012 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neitiher party, received from counsel for the respondent.
Nov 21 2012 Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Nov 21 2012 Joint appendix (exhibits volume) filed.
Nov 21 2012 Brief of petitioner Coy A. Koontz, Jr. filed.
Nov 27 2012 Brief amici curiae of Association of Florida Community Developers, et al. filed.
Nov 28 2012 Brief amicus curiae of National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center filed.
Nov 28 2012 Brief amicus curiae of Hillcrest Property, LLP filed.
Nov 28 2012 Brief amicus curiae of American Civil Rigihts Union filed.
Nov 28 2012 Brief amicus curiae of Land Use Institute, Ltd. filed.
Nov 28 2012 Brief amici curiae of National Association of Home Builders, et al. filed.
Nov 28 2012 Brief amici curiae of Atlantic Legal Foundation, et al. filed.
Nov 28 2012 Brief amici curiae of Institute for Justice, et al. filed.
Nov 28 2012 Brief amicus curiae of Owners' Counsel of America filed.
Dec 6 2012 CIRCULATED
Dec 21 2012 Brief of respondent St. Johns River Water Management District filed. (Distributed)
Dec 27 2012 Brief amici curiae of Former Members of the National Research Council Committee on Mitigating Wetland Losses filed. (Distributed)
Dec 28 2012 Brief amici curiae of National Governors Association, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Dec 28 2012 Brief amicus curiae of the United States filed. (Distributed)
Dec 28 2012 Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Dec 28 2012 Brief amici curiae of American Planning Association, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Dec 28 2012 Brief amici curiae of California, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Dec 28 2012 Record received from the Supreme Court of Florida. (1 box)
Jan 4 2013 Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Jan 8 2013 Reply of petitioner Coy A. Koontz, Jr. filed. (Distributed)
Jan 15 2013 Argued. For petitioner: Paul J. Beard, II, Sacramento, Cal. For respondent: Paul R. Q. Wolfson, Washington, D. C.; and Edwin S. Kneedler, Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.)
Jun 25 2013 Judgment REVERSED and case REMANDED. Alito, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Roberts, C. J., and Scalia, Kennedy, and Thomas, JJ., joined. Kagan, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Ginsburg, Breyer, and Sotomayor, JJ., joined.
Jul 29 2013 MANDATE ISSUED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Paul J. Beard II. Pacific Legal Foundation(916) 419-7111
    Counsel of Record930 G Street
Sacramento, CA  95814
pjb@pacificlegal.org
Party name: Coy A. Koontz, Jr.
Attorneys for Respondent:
Paul R.Q. Wolfson Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP(202) 663-6390
    Counsel of Record1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20006
paul.wolfson@wilmerhale.com
Party name: St. Johns River Water Management District
 
William H. Congdon Jr. St. Johns River Water Management District(386) 329-4314
4049 Reid Street
Palatka, FL  32177
wcongdon@sjrwmd.com
Party name: St. Johns River Water Management District
 
Timothy D. Osterhaus Deputy Solicitor General(850) 414-3300
Office of the Attorney General
PL-01 The Capitol
Tallahassee, FL  32399-1050
timothy.osterhaus@myfloridalegal.com
Party name: St. Johns River Water Management District
Other:
Michael M. Berger Manatt, Phelps & Phillips LLP(310) 312-4000
11355 West Olympic Boulevard
Los Angeles, CA  90064-1614
mmberger@manatt.com
Party name: National Association of Home Builders, et al.
 
Dana Berliner Institute for Justice(703) 682-9320
901 N. Glebe Road
Suite 900
Arlington, VA  22203
dberliner@ij.org
Party name: Institute for Justice, et al.
 
John D. Echeverria Vermont Law School(802) 831-1386
164 Chelsea Street, P.O. Box 96
South Royalton, VT  05068
JEcheverria@vermontlaw.edu
Party name: National Governors Association, et al.
 
Peter J. Ferrara 2011 Freedom Lane(703) 582-8466
Falls Church, VA  22043
peterferrara@msn.com
Party name: American Civil Rigihts Union
 
Janice L. Goldman-Carter National Wildlife Federation
901 E Street, NW
Washington, DC  20036-0000
Party name: Former Members of the National Research Council Committee on Mitigating Wetland Losses
 
Karen R. Harned NFIB Small Business Legal Center(202) 314-2048
1201 F Street, N.W. Suite 200
Washington, DC  20004
Karen.Harned@NFIB.org
Party name: National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center
 
Gary K. Hunter 119 South Monroe Street Suite 300(850)-222-7500
Tallahassee, FL  32301
garyh@hgslaw.com
Party name: Association of Florida Community Developers, et al.
 
Martin S. Kaufman Atlantic Legal Foundation(914) 834-3322
2039 Palmer Avenue
Larchmont, NY  10538
mskaufman@atlanticlegal.org
Party name: Atlantic Legal Foundation, et al.
 
Edwin S. Kneedler Deputy Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
Party name: Coy A. Koontz, Jr. v. St. Johns River Water Management District
 
Daniel L. Schmutter Greenbaum, Rowe, Smith & Davis LLP(732) 549-5600
Woodbridge, NJ  07095
dschmutter@greenbaumlaw.com
Party name: Land Use Institute, Ltd.
 
Daniel Lawrence Siegel Supervising Deputy Attorney General(916) 323-9259
Office of Attorney General
1300 I Street
Sacramento, CA  95814
Dan.Siegel@doj.ca.gov
Party name: California, et al.
 
David Smolker Bricklemyer Smolker & Bolves, P.A.(813) 223-3888
500 East Kennedy Blvd., Suite 200
Tampa, FL  33602
davids@bsbfirm.com
Party name: Hillcrest Property, LLP
 
Robert H. Thomas Damon Key Leong Kupchak Hastert(808) 531-8031
1003 Bishop Street
1600 Pauahi Tower
Honolulu, HI  96813
rht@hawaiilawyer.com
Party name: Owners' Counsel of America
 
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: the United States
 
Elizabeth B. Wydra Constitutional Accountability Center(202) 296-6889
1200 18th St., N.W., Suite 501
Washington, DC  20036
elizabeth@theusconstitution.org
Party name: American Planning Association, et al.