Docket for 09-272
No. 09-272 | |
Title: |
Athens Disposal Company, Inc, dba Athens Services, Petitioner |
v. |
Edixon Franco |
|
Docketed: | September 2, 2009 |
Lower Ct: | Court of Appeal of California, Second Appellate District |
Case Nos.: | (B203317) |
Decision Date: | March 18, 2009 |
Discretionary Court | |
Decision Date: | June 17, 2009 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Aug 31 2009 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 2, 2009) |
Sep 23 2009 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 2, 2009. |
Oct 2 2009 |
Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Pacific Legal Foundation and Ralphs Grocery Company. |
Nov 24 2009 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including December 4, 2009. |
Dec 4 2009 |
Brief of respondent Edixon Franco in opposition filed. |
Dec 15 2009 |
Reply of petitioner Athens Disposal Company, Inc, dba Athens Services filed. (Distributed) |
Dec 16 2009 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 8, 2010. |
Jan 11 2010 |
Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Pacific Legal Foundation and Ralphs Grocery Company GRANTED. |
Jan 11 2010 |
Petition DENIED. |
|