Docket for 04-636
No. 04-636 | |
Title: |
Friends of Falun Gong, et al., Petitioners |
v. |
Pacific Culture Enterprise, Inc., dba The China Press, et al. |
|
Docketed: | November 10, 2004 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (03-9156) |
Decision Date: | August 9, 2004 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Nov 8 2004 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 10, 2004) |
Dec 9 2004 |
Brief of respondent Pacific Culture Enterprise, Inc., dba The China Press in opposition filed. |
Dec 10 2004 |
Brief of respondents Sing Tao Newspapers New York, Ltd. and David Mui in opposition filed. |
Dec 21 2004 |
Reply of petitioner Friends of Falun Gong, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Dec 22 2004 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 7, 2005. |
Jan 10 2005 |
Petition DENIED. |
|