SEARCH TIPS
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
135 items found. Page: 1 of 20 for your search: horne
<< First
< Previous
Next >
Last >>
Search Results:
QPReport
14-275
HORNE
V. DEPT. OF AGRICULTURE DECISION BELOW: 750 F.3d 1128 CERT. GRANTED 1/16/2015 QUESTION
QuestionsReport
08-289
HORNE
V. FLORES DECISION BELOW: 516 F.3d 1140 CONSOLIDATED WITH 08-294 FOR ONE HOUR ORAL
QPReport
12-123
HORNE
V. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE DECISION BELOW: 673 F.3d 1071 CERT. GRANTED 11/20/2012
Day Call, Wednesday, April 22, 2015
D. C. No. 14-275. (3) MARVIN D.
HORNE
, ET AL., Petitioners V. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE. 1 hour for
Granted & Noted List - October Term 2014
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES CASES FOR ARGUMENT IN OCTOBER TERM 2014 126, Orig. KANSAS V. NEBRASKA AND COLORADO
Granted & Noted List - October Term 2012
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 10-930* CFX RYAN, DIR., AZ DOC V. GONZALES Result: REVERSED (opinion combined with No
Granted & Noted List October Term 2012 (As of July 10, 2013)
SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES OCTOBER TERM 2012 -GRANTED & NOTED LIST As of June 26, 2013 (Final 7/10/13) 10-930* CFX RYAN, DIR., AZ DOC V. GONZALES Court: USCA-9 Granted: 3/19/12 Argument Date
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##