SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
500+ items found for your search:
Thompson v Smith. 154 SE 579
Page: 1 of 72
<< First
< Previous
Next >
Last >>
Search Results:
20-659 Thompson v. Clark (04/04/2022)
Second Circuit affirmed the dismissal of
Thompson’s
claim. This Court granted certiorari to resolve a 2
THOMPSON
v
. CLARK Syllabus split among the Courts of Appeals
22-823 Thompson v. Henderson (06/30/2023)
J. SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES ALICIA
THOMPSON
v
. JANELLE HENDERSON ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI
20-5941 Thompson v. Lumpkin (03/22/2021)
an evidentiary hearing on two claims relating to his capital sentence. See
Thompson
v
. Davis, 916 F. 3d 444, 458 (2019).
Thompson
could not get a hearing, the court held, because he
579bv.pdf
of whether Page Proof Pending PublicationCite as:
579
U. S. 1 (2016) 3 Syllabus the judge's vote was dispositive, Puckett
v
. United States, 556 U. S. 129, 141. Because
19-122 Thompson v. Hebdon (11/25/2019)
Ninth Circuit agreed. 909 F. 3d 1027 (2018);
Thompson
v
. Dauphinais, 217 F. Supp. 3d 1023 (Alaska 2016 or its appearance.” 909 F. 3d, at 1034 (citing McCutcheon
v
. Fed2
THOMPSON
v
. HEBDON
21A272 Trump v. Thompson (01/19/2022)
J. TRUMP, FORMER PRESIDENT OF THE UNITED STATES
v
. BENNIE G.
THOMPSON
, IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS CHAIRMAN OF THE
589us1r01_2dq3.pdf
declined to apply this Court's precedent in Randall
v
. Sorrell, 548 U. S. 230, the last time the Pending PublicationPage Proof Pending Publication 2
THOMPSON
v
. HEBDON Per Curiam Held: The judgment is
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##