SEARCH TIPS
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
500+ items found for your search:
DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA et al. v. HELLER
Page: 1 of 72
<< First
< Previous
Next >
Last >>
Search Results:
QPReport
07-290
DISTRICT
OF
COLUMBIA
V
.
HELLER
DECISION BELOW: 478 F. 3d 370 THE PETITION FOR A WRIT OF
Miscellaneous Order (06/27/2017)
DISPOSITIONS 15-556 DOYLE, FLORENCE,
ET
AL
.
V
. TAXPAYERS FOR PUBLIC ED.,
ET
AL
. 15-557 DOUGLAS CTY. SCH. DIST.,
ET
AL
.
V
. TAXPAYERS FOR PUBLIC ED.,
ET
AL
. 15-558 COLORADO ST. BD. OF ED.,
ET
AL
Order List (08/03/2020)
REHEARINGS DENIED 19-682 KELSAY, MELANIE
V
. ERNST, MATT 19-737 DOUSE, JAMES N.
V
. UNITED STATES,
ET
AL
. 19-1021 JESSOP, MICAH,
ET
AL
.
V
. FRESNO, CA,
ET
AL
. 19-1095
Order List (12/13/2021)
21-233 ) MIKE FINNIN MOTORS, INC.,
ET
AL
.
V
. UNITED STATES,
ET
AL
. ) 21-244 ) TAYLOR & SONS,
ET
AL
.
V
. UNITED STATES,
ET
AL
. 21-264 SAN DIEGO COUNTY, CA,
ET
AL
Order List (05/01/2023)
A., ET AL. 22-752 BI RITE AUTO TRANSPORT, ET
AL
.
V
. DILDAY, RUSSELL,
ET
AL
. 22-780 MEIDE, SCOTT,
ET
AL
.
V
. CENTINEO, NOAH,
ET
AL
. 22-788 EDWARDS, PAUL
V
. McMILLEN
Order List (12/07/2015)
AL. 15-418 WYNN, DEBORAH J. V. CALLAN APPRAISAL INC.,
ET
AL
. 15-422 JONES, LAVERNE,
ET
AL
.
V
. DANCEL, BERNALDO,
ET
AL
. 15-426 EVANS, NATHALEE,
ET
AL
.
V
. McCULLOUGH
Miscellaneous Order (01/19/2017)
U.S.) THURSDAY, JANUARY 19, 2017 CERTIORARI GRANTED 15-1485
DISTRICT
OF
COLUMBIA
,
ET
AL
.
V
. WESBY, THEODORE,
ET
AL
. The motion of International Municipal Lawyers Association, Inc
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##