Title:Richard Abbott, Petitioner v. Supreme Court of Delaware, et al. |
Rehearing Denied: Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 11, 2024 PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service Response Requested. (Due April 17, 2024
| Massachusetts Coastal Railroad LLC, et al., Petitioners v. Chad Marsh |
Rehearing Denied: Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 22, 2024 Waiver of right of respondent Chad Marsh to respond filed. Response Requested. (Due February 28, 2024
| Tasha Mercedez Shelby, Petitioner v. Mississippi |
Rehearing Denied: Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 10, 2024 Response Requested. (Due April 29, 2024
| Alison Lee Gendreau, Petitioner v. United States |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 11, 2024 Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
| Monterial Wesley, Petitioner v. United States |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 29, 2024 Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
| Melynda Vincent, Petitioner v. Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General |
Application (23A509) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 14, 2023 to Brief of respondent Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General filed.
| Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General, Petitioner v. Azucena Aracely Lazo-Gavidia, et al. |
United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 10, 2024 Response Requested. (Due February 28, 2024 75 - 14th Street, NE, Suite 3050
|