Title:Alison Lee Gendreau, Petitioner v. United States |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 11, 2024 Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
| Monterial Wesley, Petitioner v. United States |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 29, 2024 Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
| Edell Jackson, Petitioner v. United States |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 5, 2024 Brief of respondent United States filed.
| Samuel Valencia, Petitioner v. United States |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 18, 2023 Brief of respondent United States filed.
| Deangelus Thomas, Petitioner v. United States |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 27, 2023 Brief of respondent United States filed.
| Nardino Colotti, et al., Petitioners v. United States |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 11, 2024 Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
| Edmond Carl Warrington, Petitioner v. United States |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 12, 2024 Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
|