No. 15-8119 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** | |||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | February 9, 2016 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (13-99006) |
Decision Date: | July 16, 2015 |
Rehearing Denied: | October 26, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jan 19 2016 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 10, 2016) |
Mar 10 2016 | Brief of respondent Ronald Davis, Warden in opposition filed. |
Mar 24 2016 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 15, 2016. |
Apr 6 2016 | Rescheduled. |
Apr 18 2016 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 22, 2016. |
Apr 25 2016 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 29, 2016. |
May 2 2016 | Petition DENIED. Justice Breyer dissenting from denial of certiorari. (Detached Opinion) |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Joel Levine | 695 Town Center Drive | (714) 662-4462 |
Counsel of Record | Suite 875 | |
Costa Mesa, CA 92626 | ||
jlesquire@cox.net | ||
Party name: Richard Delmer Boyer | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Lise S. Jacobson | Deputy Attorney General | (619)-645-2293 |
Counsel of Record | Office of the Attorney General of California | |
600 West Broadway, Suite 1800 | ||
San Diego, CA 92101 | ||
lise.jacobsondoj.ca.gov | ||
Party name: Ronald Davis, Warden |