No. 15-8 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | July 1, 2015 | |||
Lower Ct: | Court of Appeal of California, Second Appellate District |
Case Nos.: | (B245379) |
Decision Date: | January 12, 2015 |
Discretionary Court | |
Decision Date: | April 1, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jun 30 2015 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 31, 2015) |
Aug 12 2015 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 28, 2015. |
Aug 27 2015 | Response Requested . (Due September 28, 2015) |
Sep 28 2015 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including October 8, 2015. |
Oct 5 2015 | Brief of respondents Arrow Recycling Solutions, Inc., et al. in opposition filed. |
Oct 19 2015 | Reply of petitioners Applied Underwriters, Inc., et al. filed. |
Oct 21 2015 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 6, 2015. |
Nov 9 2015 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioners: | ||
Joel D. Bertocchi | Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP | (312) 704-3000 |
Counsel of Record | 222 North LaSalle Street | |
Suite 300 | ||
Chicago, IL 60601-1081 | ||
jbertocchi@hinshawlaw.com | ||
Party name: Applied Underwriters, Inc., et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents: | ||
Everett L. Skillman | 4000 MacArthur Blvd. | (714) 925-8825 |
Counsel of Record | East Tower, Suite 600 | |
Newport Beach, CA 92660 | ||
eskillman@roadrunner.com | ||
Party name: Arrow Recycling Solutions, Inc., et al. |