No. 15-643 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | November 16, 2015 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (14-5325) |
Decision Date: | August 14, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Nov 12 2015 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 16, 2015) |
Dec 7 2015 | Letter from counsel for petitioner Joseph M. Arpaio, Sheriff, Maricopa County, Arizona filed. |
Dec 15 2015 | Brief of respondents Barack H. Obama, President of the United States, et al. in opposition filed. |
Dec 30 2015 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 15, 2016. |
Dec 30 2015 | Reply of petitioner Joseph M. Arpaio, Sheriff, Maricopa County, Arizona filed. (Distributed) |
Jan 19 2016 | Petition DENIED. |
Jan 29 2016 | Petition for Rehearing filed. |
Feb 10 2016 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 26, 2016. |
Feb 29 2016 | Rehearing DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Larry Klayman | Freedom Watch, Inc. | (310) 595-0800 |
Counsel of Record | 2020 Pennsylvania Ave., N.W. | |
Suite 345 | ||
Washington, DC 20006 | ||
leklayman@gmail.com | ||
Party name: Joseph M. Arpaio, Sheriff, Maricopa County, Arizona | ||
Attorneys for Respondents: | ||
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. | Solicitor General | (202) 514-2217 |
Counsel of Record | United States Department of Justice | |
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W. | ||
Washington, DC 20530-0001 | ||
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov | ||
Party name: Barack H. Obama, President of the United States, et al. |