~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jul 23 2015 |
Application (15A115) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 3, 2015 to October 2, 2015, submitted to Justice Kennedy. |
Jul 30 2015 |
Application (15A115) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until October 2, 2015. |
Oct 2 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 5, 2015) |
Nov 6 2015 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 7, 2015. |
Nov 13 2015 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including January 6, 2016. |
Jan 6 2016 |
Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. |
Jan 19 2016 |
Reply of petitioner Joseph Edward Duncan, III filed. (Distributed) |
Jan 21 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 19, 2016. |
Feb 29 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |