No. 15-574 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | November 3, 2015 | |||
Linked with 15A262 | ||||
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Illinois |
Case Nos.: | (117876) |
Decision Date: | June 18, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Aug 28 2015 | Application (15A262) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 16, 2015 to November 2, 2015, submitted to Justice Kagan. |
Sep 1 2015 | Application (15A262) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until November 2, 2015. |
Oct 30 2015 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 3, 2015) |
Dec 1 2015 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including January 8, 2016. |
Jan 8 2016 | Brief of respondent Shelley L. Mueller in opposition filed. |
Jan 26 2016 | Reply of petitioner Christopher Mueller filed. |
Jan 27 2016 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 19, 2016. |
Feb 29 2016 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
William F. Moran III. | Stratton, Moran, Sronce, Reichert and Appleton | (217) 528-2183 |
725 South 4th Street | ||
Springfield, IL 62703 | ||
bmoran@stratton-law.com | ||
Party name: Christopher Mueller | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Charles A. Rothfeld | Mayer Brown LLP | (202) 263-3000 |
Counsel of Record | 1999 K Street, N.W. | |
Washington, DC 20006 | ||
crothfeld@mayerbrown.com | ||
Party name: Shelley L. Mueller | ||
Paul W. Hughes | Mayer Brown LLP | (202)-263-3147 |
1999 K Street NW | ||
Washington, DC 20006-1101 | ||
phughes@mayerbrown.com | ||
Party name: Shelley L. Mueller |