~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Aug 18 2015 |
Application (15A208) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 2, 2015 to October 2, 2015, submitted to The Chief Justice. |
Aug 20 2015 |
Application (15A208) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until October 2, 2015. |
Oct 2 2015 |
Motion (15M42) for leave to file a petition for a writ of certiorari with the supplemental appendix under seal filed. |
Oct 2 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 2, 2015) |
Oct 7 2015 |
MOTION (15M42) DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 30, 2015. |
Nov 2 2015 |
Motion (15M42) for leave to file a petition for a writ of certiorari with the supplemental appendix under seal Granted. |
Nov 25 2015 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including January 4, 2016. |
Dec 2 2015 |
Brief amicus curiae of American Bar Association filed. |
Dec 16 2015 |
Brief of respondent Federal Trade Commission in opposition filed. |
Dec 30 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 15, 2016. |
Dec 30 2015 |
Reply of petitioner Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. filed. (Distributed) |
Jan 19 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |