No. 15-527 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | October 26, 2015 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (14-15359) |
Decision Date: | July 20, 2015 |
Rehearing Denied: | August 26, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Oct 21 2015 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 25, 2015) |
Dec 9 2015 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 8, 2016. |
Dec 17 2015 | Response Requested . (Due January 19, 2016) |
Jan 6 2016 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including February 18, 2016. |
Feb 18 2016 | Brief of respondent Shinya Yamanaka in opposition filed. |
Feb 26 2016 | Reply of petitioner Mebo International, Inc. filed. |
Mar 2 2016 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 18, 2016. |
Mar 21 2016 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Eric Martin Schiffer | LEX OPUS APC | 949 825-6140 |
3070 Bristol Street, Suite 530 | ||
Costa Mesa, CA 92626 | ||
eschiffer@lexopusfirm.com | ||
Party name: Mebo International, Inc. | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Christopher J. Cox | Weil, Gotshal & Manges, LLP | (650) 802-3029 |
Counsel of Record | 201 Redwood Shores Parkway | |
Redwood Shores, CA 94065 | ||
chris.cox@weil.com | ||
Party name: Shinya Yamanaka |