~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Aug 13 2015 |
Application (15A173) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 26, 2015 to September 25, 2015, submitted to The Chief Justice. |
Aug 18 2015 |
Application (15A173) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until September 25, 2015. |
Sep 11 2015 |
Application (15A173) to extend further the time from September 25, 2015 to October 23, 2015, submitted to The Chief Justice. |
Sep 11 2015 |
Application (15A173) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until October 23, 2015. |
Oct 23 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 25, 2015) |
Oct 23 2015 |
Appendix of POM Wonderful, LLC, et al. filed. |
Nov 18 2015 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 28, 2015. |
Nov 23 2015 |
Brief amici curiae of Alliance for Natural Health-USA, and Cato Institute filed. |
Dec 18 2015 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including January 27, 2016. |
Jan 15 2016 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including February 26, 2016. |
Feb 17 2016 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including March 28, 2016. |
Mar 28 2016 |
Brief of respondent Federal Trade Commission in opposition filed. |
Apr 12 2016 |
Reply of petitioners POM Wonderful, LLC, et al. filed. |
Apr 13 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 29, 2016. |
May 2 2016 |
Petition DENIED. Justice Breyer took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. |