No. 15-480 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | October 15, 2015 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (14-1081) |
Decision Date: | June 15, 2015 |
Rehearing Denied: | July 13, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Oct 13 2015 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 16, 2015) |
Nov 10 2015 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 16, 2015. |
Dec 9 2015 | Brief of respondents Kenneth L.Hunter, Rick A. Donathan, and Jerry D. Medlin in opposition filed. |
Dec 23 2015 | Reply of petitioners Town of Mocksville, North Carolina, et al. filed. |
Dec 30 2015 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 15, 2016. |
Jan 19 2016 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Philip Marshall Van Hoy | Van Hoy, Reutlinger, Adams and Dunn | (704) 375-6022 |
737 East Boulevard | ||
Charlotte, NC 28203 | ||
phil.vanhoy@vradlaw.com | ||
Party name: Town of Mocksville, North Carolina, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents: | ||
Robert M. Elliot | Elliot Morgan Parsonage PLLC | (336) 724-2828 |
Counsel of Record | 426 Old Salem Road | |
Winston-Salem, NC 27101 | ||
rmelliot@emplawfirm.com | ||
Party name: Kenneth L.Hunter, Rick A. Donathan, and Jerry D. Medlin |