No. 15-478 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | October 15, 2015 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (14-765) |
Decision Date: | September 9, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Oct 13 2015 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 16, 2015) |
Nov 10 2015 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 16, 2015. |
Nov 16 2015 | Brief amici curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America and Cato Institute filed. |
Dec 15 2015 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. |
Dec 28 2015 | Reply of petitioner American International Group, Inc. filed. |
Dec 30 2015 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 15, 2016. |
Jan 8 2016 | Rescheduled. |
Jan 19 2016 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 22, 2016. |
Jan 22 2016 | Rescheduled. |
Feb 8 2016 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 19, 2016. |
Feb 24 2016 | Rescheduled. |
Feb 29 2016 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 4, 2016. |
Mar 7 2016 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
David Boies | Boies, Schiller & Flexner LLP | (914) 749-8200 |
Counsel of Record | 333 Main Street | |
Armonk, NY 10504 | ||
dboies@bsfllp.com | ||
Party name: American International Group, Inc. | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. | Solicitor General | (202) 514-2217 |
Counsel of Record | United States Department of Justice | |
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W. | ||
Washington, DC 20530-0001 | ||
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov | ||
Party name: United States | ||
Other: | ||
Scott Payne Martin | Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP | (202) 955-8500 |
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW | ||
Washington, DC 20036 | ||
smartin@gibsondunn.com | ||
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America |