No. 15-467 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | October 14, 2015 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (11-35517) |
Decision Date: | July 29, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Oct 12 2015 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 13, 2015) |
Nov 3 2015 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 14, 2015, for all respondents. |
Nov 4 2015 | Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the peittioner. |
Nov 12 2015 | Brief amici curiae of City of Craig, Alaska, et al. filed. |
Nov 13 2015 | Brief amici curiae of Alaska Forest Association, et al. filed. |
Dec 8 2015 | Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including January 19, 2016, for all respondents. |
Jan 12 2016 | Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including February 19, 2016. |
Feb 19 2016 | Brief of respondents Organized Village of Kake, Alaska, et al. in opposition filed. |
Feb 19 2016 | Brief of respondents Department of Agriculture, et al. in opposition filed. |
Mar 8 2016 | Reply of petitioner Alaska filed. (Distributed) |
Mar 9 2016 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 25, 2016. |
Mar 28 2016 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Dario Borghesan | 1031 W. Fourth Ave., | (907) 269-5100 |
Counsel of Record | Suite 200 | |
Anchorage, AK 99501 | ||
dario.borghesan@alaska.gov | ||
Party name: Alaska | ||
Attorneys for Respondents: | ||
Nathaniel S.W. Lawrence | Natural Resources Defense Council | (360) 534-9900 |
Counsel of Record | 3723 Holiday Drive, SE | |
Olympia, WA 98501 | ||
nlawrence@nrdc.org | ||
Party name: Organized Village of Kake, Alaska, et al. | ||
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. | Solicitor General | (202) 514-2217 |
Counsel of Record | United States Department of Justice | |
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W. | ||
Washington, DC 20530-0001 | ||
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov | ||
Party name: Department of Agriculture, et al. | ||
Other: | ||
James Francis Clark III. | Law Office of James F. Clark | (907) 586-0122 |
1109 C Street | ||
Juneau, AK 99801 | ||
jfclarkiii@gmail.com | ||
Party name: City of Craig, Alaska, et al. | ||
Michael E. Haglund | Haglund Kelley LLP | (503) 225-0777 |
200 SW Market St. | ||
Ste 1777 | ||
Portland, OR 97201 | ||
Party name: Alaska Forest Association, et al. |