No. 15-456 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | October 13, 2015 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (15-30211) |
Decision Date: | July 9, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Oct 7 2015 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 12, 2015) |
Nov 6 2015 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 14, 2015. |
Dec 14 2015 | Brief of respondent Certain Underwriters of Lloyd's, London in opposition filed. |
Dec 22 2015 | Reply of petitioners Joannie Jefferson, et al. filed. |
Dec 30 2015 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 15, 2016. |
Jan 19 2016 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioners: | ||
Denyse Finn Clancy | 3102 Oak Lawn Avenue | 214-521-3605 |
Counsel of Record | Suite 1100 | |
Dallas, TX 75219 | ||
dclancy@baronbudd.com | ||
Party name: Joannie Jefferson, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
D. Ashbrooke Tullis | Taylor Wellons Politz Duhe, APLC | (504) 525-9888 |
Counsel of Record | 1515 Poydras St., Suite 1900 | |
New Orleans, LA 70112 | ||
Party name: Certain Underwriters of Lloyd's, London | ||
Paula M. Wellons | 1515 Poydras Street, Suite 1900 | (504) 525-9888 |
Counsel of Record | New Orleans, LA 70119 | |
pwellons@twpdlaw.com | ||
Party name: Certain Underwriters of Lloyd's, London |