No. 15-319 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | September 14, 2015 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (14-20-cv) |
Decision Date: | August 20, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Sep 14 2015 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 14, 2015) |
Oct 14 2015 | Brief of respondents Jonathan Denbo, et al. in opposition filed. |
Oct 27 2015 | Reply of petitioner UnitedHealth Group, Inc., et al. filed. |
Oct 28 2015 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 13, 2015. |
Nov 16 2015 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioners: | ||
Catherine E. Stetson | Hogan Lovells US LLP | (202) 637-5600 |
Counsel of Record | 555 Thirteenth Street, N.W. | |
Washington, DC 20004 | ||
cate.stetson@hoganlovells.com | ||
Party name: UnitedHealth Group, Inc., et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents: | ||
D. Brian Hufford | Zuckerman Spaeder, LLP | (212) 704-9600 |
Counsel of Record | 399 Park Avenue, 14th Floor | |
New York, NY 100232 | ||
dbhufford@zuckerman.com | ||
Party name: Jonathan Denbo, et al. |