~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jul 16 2015 |
Application (15A42) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 26, 2015 to August 25, 2015, submitted to Justice Sotomayor. |
Jul 17 2015 |
Application (15A42) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until August 25, 2015. |
Aug 24 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 25, 2015) |
Sep 14 2015 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including October 26, 2015. |
Sep 15 2015 |
Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for petitioners. |
Sep 22 2015 |
Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for respondents. |
Oct 26 2015 |
Brief of respondents Embarq Corporation, et al. in opposition filed. |
Nov 9 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 24, 2015. |
Nov 9 2015 |
Reply of petitioners William Douglas Fulghum, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Nov 30 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |