No. 15-156 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | August 4, 2015 | |||
Linked with 14A1205 | ||||
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Vermont |
Case Nos.: | (2014-192) |
Decision Date: | March 6, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
May 22 2015 | Application (14A1205) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 4, 2015 to August 3, 2015, submitted to Justice Ginsburg. |
May 28 2015 | Application (14A1205) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until August 3, 2015. |
Aug 3 2015 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 3, 2015) |
Aug 18 2015 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including October 5, 2015. |
Oct 5 2015 | Brief of respondent City of Burlington, Vermont in opposition filed. |
Oct 21 2015 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 6, 2015. |
Oct 21 2015 | Reply of petitioners Richard Joseph, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Nov 9 2015 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioners: | ||
David C. Frederick | Kellogg, Huber, Hansen, Todd, Evans & Figel, P.L.L.C. | (202) 326-7900 |
1615 M Street, N.W., Suite 400 | ||
Washington, DC 20036 | ||
dfrederick@khhte.com | ||
Party name: Richard Joseph, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents: | ||
Geoffrey Hobart Hand | Dunkiel Saunders Elliot Raubvogel & Hand PLLC | 802-860-1003 |
Counsel of Record | 91 College Street | |
P.O. Box 545 | ||
Burlington, VT 05401-0545 | ||
ghand@dunkielsaunders.com | ||
Party name: City of Burlington, Vermont, et al. |