No. 15-1309 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | April 26, 2016 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (14-2164) |
Decision Date: | December 16, 2015 |
Rehearing Denied: | January 25, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Apr 22 2016 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 26, 2016) |
May 23 2016 | Brief of respondent United States, ex rel. Robert Gadbois in opposition filed. |
May 26 2016 | Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by New England Legal Foundation. |
Jun 6 2016 | Reply of petitioner PharMerica Corporation filed. |
Jun 7 2016 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 23, 2016. |
Jun 27 2016 | Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by New England Legal Foundation GRANTED. |
Jun 27 2016 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Jerrold J. Ganzfried | Holland & Knight LLP | (202) 469-5151 |
800 17th Street, N.W., Suite 1100 | ||
Washington, DC 20006 | ||
jerry.ganzfried@hklaw.com | ||
Party name: PharMerica Corporation | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Amato A. DeLuca | DeLuca & Weizenbaum, Ltd. | (401) 453-1500 |
Counsel of Record | 199 North Main Street | |
Providence, RI 02903 | ||
bud@dwlaw.us | ||
Party name: United States, ex rel. Robert Gadbois | ||
Other: | ||
Benjamin G. Robbins | New England Legal Foundation | (617) 695-3660 |
150 Lincoln Street | ||
Boston, MA 02111-2504 | ||
benrobbins@nelfonline.org | ||
Party name: New England Legal Foundation |