No. 15-1266 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | April 13, 2016 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (15-2216) |
Decision Date: | January 13, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Apr 8 2016 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 13, 2016) |
May 4 2016 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including June 13, 2016. |
Jun 13 2016 | Brief of respondent Loretta E. Lynch, Attorney General in opposition filed. |
Jun 27 2016 | Reply of petitioner Luis Gutierrez-Rostran filed. |
Jun 29 2016 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 26, 2016. |
Oct 3 2016 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Abigail L. Seif | Epstein Cohen Seif & Porter | 317-639-1326 |
50 S. Meridian Street | ||
#505 | ||
Indianapolis, IN 46204 | ||
abbyhur@aol.com | ||
Party name: Luis Gutierrez-Rostran | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Ian Heath Gershengorn | Acting Solicitor General | (202) 514-2217 |
United States Department of Justice | ||
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W. | ||
Washington, DC 20530-0001 | ||
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov | ||
Party name: Loretta E. Lynch, Attorney General |