No. 15-1239 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | April 4, 2016 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (11-18028) |
Decision Date: | January 22, 2016 |
Rehearing Denied: | February 10, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Mar 31 2016 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 4, 2016) |
Apr 22 2016 | Waiver of right of respondent City of Richmond, California to respond filed. |
May 3 2016 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 19, 2016. |
May 23 2016 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioners: | ||
Dennis Scott Zell | Zell and Associates | (650) 548-2501 |
Counsel of Record | 533 Airport Boulevard, Fourth Floor | |
Burlingame, CA 94010 | ||
dennis@zell-legal.net | ||
Party name: Jeffrey Herson, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Matthew D. Zinn | 396 Hayes St. | (415)-552-7272 |
Counsel of Record | San Francisco, CA 94102 | |
zinn@smwlaw.com | ||
Party name: City of Richmond, California |