No. 15-1224 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | March 31, 2016 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (14-60039) |
Decision Date: | January 8, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Mar 28 2016 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 2, 2016) |
Apr 7 2016 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including July 1, 2016. |
Jun 22 2016 | Brief of respondent Eden Place, LLC in opposition filed. |
Jul 1 2016 | Reply of petitioner Sholem Perl filed. |
Jul 6 2016 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 26, 2016. |
Oct 3 2016 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Leib M. Lerner | 333 South Hope Street, 16th Floor | (213)-576-1000 |
Counsel of Record | Los Angeles, CA 90071 | |
leib.lerner@alston.com | ||
Party name: Sholem Perl | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Ronald Richards | P.O. Box 11480 | (310) 556-1001 |
Counsel of Record | Beverly Hills, CA 90213 | |
ron@ronaldrichards.com | ||
Party name: Eden Place, LLC |