No. 15-1185 | ||||
Vide 15-1291 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | March 22, 2016 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (14-56104, 14-56105) |
Decision Date: | December 18, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Mar 17 2016 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 21, 2016) |
Mar 29 2016 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including May 20, 2016. |
May 20 2016 | Brief of respondent Pauma Band of Luiseno Mission Indians of the Pauma & Yuima Reservation in opposition filed. |
Jun 3 2016 | Reply of petitioners California, et al. filed. |
Jun 7 2016 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 23, 2016. |
Jun 27 2016 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioners: | ||
Michael J. Mongan | Office of the Attorney General | (415) 703-2548 |
Counsel of Record | 455 Golden Gate Avenue | |
Suite 11000 | ||
San Francisco, CA 94102 | ||
michael.mongan@doj.ca.gov | ||
Party name: California, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Kevin M. Cochrane | Williams & Cochrane, LLP | (619) 793-4809 |
Counsel of Record | 42072 5th St., Suite 103 | |
Temecula, CA 92590 | ||
kmc@williamscochrane.com | ||
Party name: Pauma Band of Luiseno Mission Indians of the Pauma & Yuima Reservation |