No. 15-1177 | ||||
Vide 15-1140, 15-8582 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | March 21, 2016 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (14-2809, 14-2873) |
Decision Date: | October 26, 2015 |
Rehearing Denied: | December 14, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Mar 10 2016 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 20, 2016) |
Apr 13 2016 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including May 20, 2016. |
May 13 2016 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. VIDED. |
May 31 2016 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 16, 2016. |
Jun 20 2016 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Roger Lee Stavis | Gallet Dryer & Berkley, LLP | (212) 935-3131 |
Counsel of Record | 845 Third Avenue, 8th Floor | |
New York, NY 10022 | ||
Party name: James Kevin Kergil | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. | Solicitor General | (202) 514-2217 |
Counsel of Record | United States Department of Justice | |
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W. | ||
Washington, DC 20530-0001 | ||
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov | ||
Party name: United States |