No. 15-1150 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | March 16, 2016 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (15-12625) |
Decision Date: | December 15, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Mar 14 2016 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 15, 2016) |
Apr 7 2016 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including May 16, 2016. |
May 16 2016 | Brief of respondent Carolyn W. Colvin, Acting Commissioner of Social Security in opposition filed. |
May 31 2016 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 16, 2016. |
May 31 2016 | Reply of petitioner Sonya Hunter filed. (Distributed) |
Jun 20 2016 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Tejinder Singh | Goldstein & Russell, P.C. | (202)-362-0636 |
Counsel of Record | 7475 Wisconsin Ave. | |
Suite 850 | ||
Bethesda, MD 20814 | ||
tsingh@goldsteinrussell.com | ||
Party name: Sonya Hunter | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. | Solicitor General | (202) 514-2217 |
Counsel of Record | United States Department of Justice | |
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W. | ||
Washington, DC 20530-0001 | ||
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov | ||
Party name: Carolyn W. Colvin, Acting Commissioner of Social Security |