~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Nov 9 2015 |
Application (15A492) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 21, 2015 to February 19, 2016, submitted to The Chief Justice. |
Nov 10 2015 |
Application (15A492) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until February 19, 2016. |
Feb 18 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 14, 2016) |
Apr 8 2016 |
Brief of respondents Fairfax County School Board, et al. in opposition filed. |
Apr 13 2016 |
Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Camden County East Branch of the N.A.A.C.P., et al. |
Apr 18 2016 |
Opposition respondents to motion for leave to file file brief of amici Curiae of Fairfax County School board, et al. filed. |
Apr 20 2016 |
Reply of petitioner Cynthia Lee filed. |
Apr 26 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 12, 2016. |
May 16 2016 |
Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Camden County East Branch of the N.A.A.C.P., et al. GRANTED. |
May 16 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |