No. 15-1144 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | March 15, 2016 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (14-11498) |
Decision Date: | October 16, 2015 |
Rehearing Denied: | December 11, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Mar 10 2016 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 14, 2016) |
Apr 8 2016 | Waiver of right of respondents Troup County, Georgia, School District, et al. to respond filed. |
Apr 19 2016 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 12, 2016. |
Apr 21 2016 | Response Requested . (Due May 23, 2016) |
May 23 2016 | Brief of respondents Troup County, Georgia, School District, et al. in opposition filed. |
Jun 6 2016 | Reply of petitioner Charles Flowers filed. (Distributed) |
Jun 7 2016 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 23, 2016. |
Jun 27 2016 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Eric Schnapper | University of Washington | (206) 616-3167 |
School of Law | ||
P.O. Box 353020 | ||
Seattle, WA 98195 | ||
schnapp@uw.edu | ||
Party name: Charles Flowers | ||
Attorneys for Respondents: | ||
Kenneth Drew Jones | Hall Booth Smith, P.C. | (404) 954-6960 |
Counsel of Record | 191 Peachtree Street, NE, Suite 2900 | |
Atlanta, GA 30303 | ||
kjones@hallboothsmith.com | ||
Party name: Troup County, Georgia, School District, et al. |