No. 15-1084 | ||||
Vide 15-8388 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | February 26, 2016 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (13-2078) |
Decision Date: | September 30, 2015 |
Rehearing Denied: | December 1, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Feb 26 2016 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 28, 2016) |
Mar 24 2016 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including April 27, 2016. |
Apr 27 2016 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. |
May 11 2016 | Reply of petitioner Terrance Daniels filed. |
May 17 2016 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 2, 2016. |
Jun 6 2016 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Sallie G. Smylie | Kirkland & Ellis LLP | (312) 862-2000 |
Counsel of Record | 300 N. LaSalle | |
Chicago, IL 60654 | ||
ssmylie@kirkland.com | ||
Party name: Terrance Daniels | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. | Solicitor General | (202) 514-2217 |
Counsel of Record | United States Department of Justice | |
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W. | ||
Washington, DC 20530-0001 | ||
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov | ||
Party name: United States |