No. 15-1021 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | February 12, 2016 | |||
Linked with 15A1209 | ||||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (14-5879) |
Decision Date: | October 6, 2015 |
Rehearing Denied: | November 12, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Feb 10 2016 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 14, 2016) |
Mar 3 2016 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including April 13, 2016, for all respondents. |
Apr 13 2016 | Brief of respondents Alicia M. Pedreira, Paul Simmons, Johanna W.H. Van Wijk-Bos, Elwood Sturtevant in opposition filed. |
Apr 13 2016 | Brief of respondents Vickie Yates Brown Glisson, Secretary, Kentucky Cabinet for Health and Family Services, et al. in support filed. |
Apr 28 2016 | Reply of petitioner Sunrise Children's Services, Inc. filed. |
May 3 2016 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 19, 2016. |
May 23 2016 | Petition DENIED. |
May 24 2016 | Application (15A1209) to suspend the effect of the denial of the petition for a writ of certiorari, submitted to Justice Kagan. |
May 26 2016 | Application (15A1209) denied by Justice Kagan. |
Jun 9 2016 | Petition for Rehearing filed. |
Jun 23 2016 | DISTRIBUTED. |
Jul 18 2016 | Rehearing DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
John O. Sheller | Stoll Keenon Ogden PLLC | (502) 333-6000 |
Counsel of Record | 500 West Jefferson Street | |
Suite 2000 | ||
Louisville, KY 40202 | ||
john.sheller@skofirm.com | ||
Party name: Sunrise Children's Services, Inc. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents: | ||
R. Stanton Jones | Arnold & Porter LLP | (202) 942-5563 |
Counsel of Record | 601 Massachusetts Ave, NW | |
Washington, DC 20001-3743 | ||
stanton.jones@aporter.com | ||
Party name: Alicia M. Pedreira, Paul Simmons, Johanna W.H. Van Wijk-Bos, Elwood Sturtevant | ||
Mark Stephen Pitt | General Counsel | (502) 564-2611 |
Counsel of Record | Office of the Governor | |
700 Capitol Avenue, Suite 101 | ||
Frankfort, KY 40601 | ||
steve.pitt@ky.gov | ||
Party name: Vickie Yates Brown Glisson, Secretary, Kentucky Cabinet for Health and Family Services, et al. |