No. 15-10 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** | |||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | July 1, 2015 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (13-70033) |
Decision Date: | March 4, 2015 |
Rehearing Denied: | March 31, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jun 29 2015 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 31, 2015) |
Jul 31 2015 | Brief amicus curiae of American Bar Association filed. |
Aug 7 2015 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 31, 2015. |
Sep 3 2015 | Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including September 18, 2015. |
Sep 18 2015 | Brief of respondent Marshall L. Fisher, Commissioner, Mississippi Department of Corrections in opposition filed. |
Oct 5 2015 | Reply of petitioner Thomas Edwin Loden, Jr. filed. |
Oct 7 2015 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 30, 2015. |
Nov 2 2015 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Joseph R. Palmore | Morrison & Foerster, LLP | (202) 887-6940 |
2000 Pennsylvania Ave., NW | ||
Washington, DC 20006 | ||
JPalmore@mofo.com | ||
Party name: Thomas Edwin Loden, Jr. | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Marvin L. White Jr. | Assistant Attorney General | (601) 359-3813 |
Counsel of Record | 450 High Street | |
P.O. Box 220 | ||
Jackson, MS 39205 | ||
Party name: Marshall L. Fisher, Commissioner, Mississippi Department of Corrections | ||
Other: | ||
William C. Hubbard | American Bar Association | (312) 988-5000 |
321 North Clark Street | ||
Chicago, IL 60654 | ||
abapresident@americanbar.org | ||
Party name: American Bar Association |