No. 14-959 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | February 9, 2015 | |||
Linked with 14A545 | ||||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (13-3357, 13-4340) |
Decision Date: | July 30, 2014 |
Rehearing Denied: | September 11, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Nov 21 2014 | Application (14A545) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 10, 2014 to February 6, 2015, submitted to Justice Kagan. |
Nov 21 2014 | Application (14A545) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until February 6, 2015. |
Feb 6 2015 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 11, 2015) |
Feb 27 2015 | Brief of respondents Thomas E. Killion, et al. in opposition filed. |
Mar 17 2015 | Reply of petitioner KeHE Distributors, LLC filed. |
Mar 18 2015 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 3, 2015. |
Apr 6 2015 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Cardelle Bratton Spangler | 35 West Wacker Drive | 312-558-7541 |
Chicago, IL 60601 | ||
cspangler@winston.com | ||
Party name: KeHE Distributors, LLC | ||
Attorneys for Respondents: | ||
Robert Alan Bunda | Bunda, Stutz & Dewitt, PLL | (419) 254-3122 |
Counsel of Record | 3295 Levis Commons Blvd., | |
Perrysburg, OH 43551 | ||
rabunda@bsd-law.com | ||
Party name: Thomas E. Killion, et al. |