No. 14-891
Title:
SuperValu, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
D&G, Inc., dba Gary's Foods
Docketed:January 23, 2015
Linked with 14A490
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(13-1297)
  Decision Date:May 21, 2014
  Rehearing Denied:August 19, 2014

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Nov 6 2014 Application (14A490) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 17, 2014 to January 16, 2015, submitted to Justice Alito.
Nov 7 2014 Application (14A490) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until December 17, 2014.
Dec 5 2014 Application (14A490) to extend further the time from December 17, 2014 to January 16, 2015, submitted to Justice Alito.
Dec 8 2014 Application (14A490) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until January 16, 2015.
Jan 16 2015 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 23, 2015)
Feb 9 2015 Waiver of right of respondent D&G, Inc., dba Gary's Foods to respond filed.
Feb 23 2015 Brief amicus curiae of The Food Marketing Institute filed. (Distributed)
Feb 25 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 20, 2015.
Feb 27 2015 Response Requested . (Due March 30, 2015)
Mar 11 2015 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including April 29, 2015.
Apr 29 2015 Brief of respondent D&G, Inc., dba Gary's Foods in opposition filed.
May 18 2015 Reply of petitioners SuperValu, et al. filed.
May 19 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 4, 2015.
Jun 8 2015 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioners:
Aaron M. Streett Baker Botts L.L.P.(713) 229-1234
910 Louisiana Street
Houston, TX  77002-4995
aaron.streett@bakerbotts.com
Party name: SuperValu, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent:
W. Joseph Bruckner Lockridge Grindal Nauen PLLP(612) 339-6900
    Counsel of Record100 Washington Avenue South, Suite 2200
Minneapolis, MN  55401-2179
wjbruckner@locklaw.com
Party name: D&G, Inc., dba Gary's Foods
 
Richard Bruce Drubel Jr. Boies Schiller & Flexner LLP(603) 649-9090
    Counsel of Record26 South Main Street
Hanover, NH  03755
rdrubel@bsfllp.com
Party name: D&G, Inc., dba Gary's Foods
Other:
Thomas R. McCarthy 3033 Wilson Boulevard, Suite 700703-243-9423
Arlington, VA  22201
tom@consovoymccarthy.com
Party name: The Food Marketing Institute