No. 14-567 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** | |||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | November 17, 2014 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (12-70022) |
Decision Date: | May 12, 2014 |
Rehearing Denied: | August 13, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Nov 12 2014 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 17, 2014) |
Dec 1 2014 | Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the petitioner. |
Dec 16 2014 | Brief of respondent Burl Cain, Warden in opposition filed. |
Dec 17 2014 | Brief amicus curiae of The Constitution Project filed. |
Dec 17 2014 | Brief amici curiae of Louisiana Center for Children's Rights, et al. filed. |
Dec 24 2014 | Reply of petitioner Jessie Hoffman filed. |
Dec 30 2014 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 16, 2015. |
Jan 20 2015 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Sarah L. Ottinger | The Capital Appeals Project | (504) 529-5955 |
636 Baronne Street | ||
New Orleans, LA 70113 | ||
Party name: Jessie Hoffman | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Kathryn Landry | Kathryn W. Landry, LLC | (225) 766-0023 |
Counsel of Record | Post Office Box 82659 | |
Baton Rouge, LA 70884 | ||
Kathilandry@aol.com | ||
Party name: Burl Cain, Warden | ||
Other: | ||
Jonathan S. Franklin | Fulbright & Jaworski L.L.P. | (202) 662-0466 |
801 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W. | ||
Washington, DC 20004 | ||
jonathan.franklin@nortonrosefulbright.com | ||
Party name: The Constitution Project | ||
Carol A. Kolinchak | Louisiana Center for Children's Rights | (504) 522-5437 |
2018 Oretha Castle Haley Boulevard | ||
New Orleans, LA 70113 | ||
ckolinchak@jjpl.org | ||
Party name: Louisiana Center for Children's Rights, et al. |