No. 14-540 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | November 13, 2014 | |||
Linked with 14A312 | ||||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (12-15185) |
Decision Date: | April 4, 2014 |
Rehearing Denied: | June 30, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Sep 18 2014 | Application (14A312) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 28, 2014 to November 27, 2014, submitted to Justice Kennedy. |
Sep 23 2014 | Application (14A312) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until November 12, 2014. |
Nov 12 2014 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 15, 2014) |
Dec 15 2014 | Brief amicus curiae of Generic Pharmaceutical Association filed. |
Dec 15 2014 | Brief of respondent Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. in opposition filed. |
Dec 29 2014 | Reply of petitioners Panasonic Corporation, et al. filed. |
Dec 30 2014 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 16, 2015. |
Jan 20 2015 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioners: | ||
Jeffrey L. Kessler | Winston & Strawn, LLP | (212) 294-6700 |
200 Park Avenue | ||
New York, NY 10166 | ||
Party name: Panasonic Corporation, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Kathleen M. Sullivan | Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP | (212) 849-7000 |
Counsel of Record | 51 Madison Ave., 22nd Floor | |
New York, NY 10010 | ||
kathleensullivan@quinnemanuel.com | ||
Party name: Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. | ||
Other: | ||
William M. Jay | Goodwin Procter LLP | (202) 346-4000 |
901 New York Avenue, N.W. | ||
Washington, DC 20001 | ||
wjay@goodwinprocter.com | ||
Party name: Generic Pharmaceutical Association |