~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Aug 8 2014 |
Application (14A186) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 21, 2014 to September 25, 2014, submitted to Justice Ginsburg. |
Aug 13 2014 |
Application (14A186) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until September 25, 2014. |
Sep 25 2014 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 29, 2014) |
Oct 20 2014 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 28, 2014, for all respondents. |
Nov 26 2014 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including December 2, 2014, for all respondents. |
Dec 2 2014 |
Brief of respondents Shawn Michael Vincent, et al. in opposition filed. |
Dec 16 2014 |
Reply of petitioner Anthony J. Annucci filed. (Distributed) |
Dec 17 2014 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 9, 2015. |
Jan 12 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |