No. 14-355 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | September 26, 2014 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (12-3780) |
Decision Date: | June 26, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Sep 24 2014 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 27, 2014) |
Oct 8 2014 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 26, 2014. |
Nov 26 2014 | Brief of respondents Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, et al. in opposition filed. |
Dec 4 2014 | Reply of petitioner Angela Ames filed. |
Dec 10 2014 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 9, 2015. |
Jan 12 2015 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Eric Schnapper | University of Washington School of Law | (206) 616-3167 |
Counsel of Record | P.O. Box 353020 | |
Seattle, WA 98195 | ||
schnapp@u.washington.edu | ||
Party name: Angela Ames | ||
Attorneys for Respondents: | ||
Dinita L. James | Gonzales Saggio & Harlan, LLP | 602-840-3301 |
Counsel of Record | 2999 North 44th Street, Suite 130 | |
Phoenix, AZ 85018-7281 | ||
dinita_james@gshllp.com | ||
Party name: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, et al. | ||
Louis Bennett Butler Jr. | 111 East Wisconsin Ave. | |
Suite 1000 | ||
Milwaukee, WI 53202 | ||
Party name: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, et al. |