No. 14-281 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | September 9, 2014 | |||
Linked with 14A140 | ||||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (11-15132) |
Decision Date: | April 1, 2014 |
Rehearing Denied: | May 12, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jul 31 2014 | Application (14A140) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 10, 2014 to September 9, 2014, submitted to Justice Kennedy. |
Aug 3 2014 | Application (14A140) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until September 9, 2014. |
Sep 9 2014 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 9, 2014) |
Sep 30 2014 | Brief of respondents Patricia McManaman, Director, Hawaii Department of Human Services, et al. in opposition filed. |
Oct 14 2014 | Reply of petitioners Tony Korab, et al. filed. |
Oct 15 2014 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 31, 2014. |
Nov 3 2014 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioners: | ||
Kannon K. Shanmugam | Williams & Connolly LLP | (202) 434-5000 |
725 Twelfth Street, N.W. | ||
Washington, DC 20005 | ||
kshanmugam@wc.com | ||
Party name: Tony Korab, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents: | ||
Neal Kumar Kaytal | 555 13th Street NW | (202) 637-5528 |
Counsel of Record | Washington, DC 20004 | |
neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com | ||
Party name: Patricia McManaman, Director, Hawaii Department of Human Services, et al. |