No. 14-235 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | August 28, 2014 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (14-10062) |
Decision Date: | April 17, 2014 |
Rehearing Denied: | June 17, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Aug 27 2014 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 29, 2014) |
Oct 15 2014 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 31, 2014. |
Oct 17 2014 | Response Requested . (Due November 17, 2014) |
Nov 5 2014 | Brief of respondent Dayo Bello in opposition filed. |
Nov 7 2014 | Reply of petitioner Bank of America, N.A. filed. |
Nov 10 2014 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 25, 2014. |
Jun 1 2015 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 4, 2015. |
Jun 8 2015 | Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Bank of America, N. A. v. Caulkett, 575 U. S. ___ (2015). |
Jul 10 2015 | JUDGMENT ISSUED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Danielle Spinelli | Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP | (202) 663-6000 |
Counsel of Record | 1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW | |
Washington, DC 20006 | ||
danielle.spinelli@wilmerhale.com | ||
Party name: Bank of America, N.A. | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Stephanos Bibas | University of Pennsylvania Law School | (215) 746-2297 |
Counsel of Record | Supreme Court Clinic | |
3501 Sansom Street | ||
Philadelphia, PA 19104 | ||
sbibas@law.upenn.edu | ||
Party name: Dayo Bello | ||
Lisa Marie Roberts | 909 Eagles Landing Parkway | (404) 241-2441 |
Counsel of Record | Suite 440 | |
Stockbridge, GA 30281 | ||
lsampson_roberts@yahoo.com | ||
Party name: Dayo Bello |