~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Aug 12 2014 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 15, 2014) |
Sep 12 2014 |
Waiver of right of respondent Utah to respond filed. |
Oct 1 2014 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 17, 2014. |
Oct 15 2014 |
Response Requested . (Due November 14, 2014) |
Nov 5 2014 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 15, 2014. |
Dec 15 2014 |
Brief of respondent Utah in opposition filed. |
Dec 22 2014 |
Reply of petitioner Kenneth Trotter filed. (Distributed) |
Dec 23 2014 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 9, 2015. |
Jan 12 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |