No. 14-1535 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | June 26, 2015 | |||
Linked with 14A1120 | ||||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (10-4774, 11-4587, 12-2077) |
Decision Date: | January 20, 2015 |
Rehearing Denied: | February 25, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
May 1 2015 | Application (14A1120) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 26, 2015 to June 25, 2015, submitted to Justice Alito. |
May 4 2015 | Application (14A1120) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until June 25, 2015. |
Jun 25 2015 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 27, 2015) |
Jul 6 2015 | Consent to the fiing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from cousnel for petitioner. |
Jul 22 2015 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 26, 2015. |
Jul 27 2015 | Brief amicus curiae of California Attorneys for Criminal Justice filed. |
Jul 27 2015 | Brief amici curiae of Former Federal Prosecutors, et al. filed. |
Jul 27 2015 | Brief amicus curiae of The Center on the Administration of Criminal Law filed. |
Aug 11 2015 | Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including September 25, 2015. |
Sep 25 2015 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. |
Oct 13 2015 | Reply of petitioner George Georgiou filed. |
Oct 14 2015 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 30, 2015. |
Nov 2 2015 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Neal Kumar Katyal | Hogan Lovells US LLP | (202) 637-5600 |
555 Thirteenth Street, N.W. | ||
Washington, DC 20004 | ||
neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com | ||
Party name: George Georgiou | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. | Solicitor General | (202) 514-2217 |
United States Department of Justice | ||
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W. | ||
Washington, DC 20530-0001 | ||
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov | ||
Party name: United States | ||
Other: | ||
Helen Virginia Cantwell | Debevoise & Plimpton, LLP | (212) 909-6000 |
919 Third Avenue | ||
New York, NY 10022 | ||
hvcantwell@debevoise.com | ||
Party name: The Center on the Administration of Criminal Law | ||
John W. Keker | Keker & Van Nest LLP | (415) 391-5400 |
633 Battery Street | ||
San Francisco, CA 94111-1809 | ||
jjkeker@kvn.com | ||
Party name: California Attorneys for Criminal Justice | ||
Seth P. Waxman | Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP | (202) 663-6000 |
1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W. | ||
Washington, DC 20006 | ||
seth.waxman@wilmerhale.com | ||
Party name: Former Federal Prosecutors, et al. |