No. 14-151 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | August 12, 2014 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (12-55700) |
Decision Date: | April 2, 2014 |
Rehearing Denied: | May 13, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Aug 8 2014 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 11, 2014) |
Oct 1 2014 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 17, 2014. |
Oct 15 2014 | Response Requested . (Due November 14, 2014) |
Oct 23 2014 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 15, 2014. |
Dec 12 2014 | Brief of respondents City of Long Beach, California, et al. in opposition filed. |
Dec 23 2014 | Reply of petitioners Keischa Wilson, et vir filed. |
Dec 30 2014 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 16, 2015. |
Jan 20 2015 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioners: | ||
Brian Thomas Dunn | 4929 Wilshire Boulevard | (323) 435-8205 |
Counsel of Record | Suite 1010 | |
Los Angeles, CA 90010 | ||
bdunn@cochranfirm.com | ||
Party name: Keischa Wilson, et vir | ||
Attorneys for Respondents: | ||
Timothy T. Coates | Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland LLP | (310) 859-7811 |
Counsel of Record | 5900 Wilshire Blvd., 12th Floor | |
Los Angeles, CA 90036 | ||
tcoates@gmsr.com | ||
Party name: City of Long Beach, California, et al. |